Pryszlak, Michael (CPSO#: 50743)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 6300 Walkers Line Burlington, ON L7M 0R3
Date Received: 01 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 31 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015