Psenicka, Paul (CPSO#: 24927)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:University of Palacky, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1972
Suspension of registration imposed: Board of Inquiry Effective: 19 Jul 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Dec 1981
Summary:

 In December 1981, Dr. Psenicka pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, in that he had been found guilty of an offence 
 relevant to his suitability to practice.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found 
 Dr. Psenicka guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Psenicka be reprimanded and recommended that his name be published in the College Reports.  The 
 Committee further ruled that the Doctor's licence to practice be suspended for a period of thirty 
 days, and that he be fined the sum of $2000.00, with the proviso that if he failed to pay this 
 amount, his licence would be suspended for an additional thirty days.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 14 Dec 1981