Pua, Hwee Leng (CPSO#: 71044)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Apr 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Apr 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Singapore, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 22 Apr 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Apr 1998