Puchalski, Stephen Alexander (CPSO#: 55355)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44890
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Puchalski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Puchalski ( CPSO# 55355 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN ALEXANDER PUCHALSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUCHALSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1987