Pudupakkam, Santosh (CPSO#: 67828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oaks Plaza
Unit 3 4 5
2140 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5S8
Phone: (705) 522-4611
Fax: (705) 522-4158
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Santosh Pudupakkam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pudupakkam ( CPSO# 67828 )

Business Address:
Oaks Plaza
Unit 3-4-5
2140 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5S8
Phone Number: (705) 522-4611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 19 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANTOSH PUDUPAKKAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUDUPAKKAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000