Pugh, David Michael Walter (CPSO#: 66651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-2728
Fax: (519) 751-1910
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Pugh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pugh ( CPSO# 66651 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5857

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL WALTER PUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998