Pui, Margaret Hing Wah (CPSO#: 33274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
88 Heddington Ave
Toronto ON  M5N 2K8
Phone: (416) 481-3139
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ethiopia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET HING WAH PUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1987 to 30 Nov 1987
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jan 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2000