Puksa, Serhij (CPSO#: 51725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
730 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Phone: (905) 387-5543
Fax: (905) 387-3713
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Puksa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Puksa ( CPSO# 51725 )

Business Address:
730 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Phone Number: (905) 375-5543

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SERHIJ PUKSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUKSA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1983