Pulickamalil, Jolly Manual (CPSO#: 87449)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Calicut University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 16 Jul 2007 to 07 Oct 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 08 Oct 2007 to 15 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 16 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009