Pulido, Analene Flora (CPSO#: 70807)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Feb 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:Far Eastern University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gateway Corporate Centre
Unit 120
10 Gateway Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3C 3A1
Phone: (416) 422-3642
Fax: (416) 422-0487
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4119 Bathurst St.
Toronto ON  M3H 3P4
Canada
Phone: (647) 346-3425
Fax: (647) 346-8350
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Analene F. Pulido Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pulido ( CPSO# 70807 )

Business Address:
120 - 10 Gateway Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3C 3A1
Phone Number: (416) 422-3642

Business Address:
4119 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3P4
Phone Number: (647) 346-8350

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANALENE FLORA PULIDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PULIDO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2001