Pullan, Wendy Margaret (CPSO#: 58131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Medical Centre
Suite 300
5307 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9M2
Phone: (613) 746-6223
Fax: (613) 746-6018
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wendy M. Pullan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Pullan ( CPSO# 58131 )

Business Address:
Queensway Medical Centre
Suite 300
5307 Canotek Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9M2
Phone Number: (613) 746-6223

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY MARGARET PULLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PULLAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1988