Pullen, Brock Leslie (CPSO#: 27081)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jan 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013