Pullerits, John (CPSO#: 28430)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 21 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 10 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Apr 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 Oct 1992