Pun, Jochebed Jolie (CPSO#: 88555)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
333 Athlone Ave
suite 106
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone: (519) 537-5775
Fax: (519) 537-7582
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jochebed Pun Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pun ( CPSO# 88555 )

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 933-3889

Business Address:
106 - 333 Athlone
Woodstock ON  N4V 0B8
Phone Number: (519) 537-5775

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOCHEBED JOLIE PUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013