Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Punnen, Chinnamma (CPSO#: 57716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Punnen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Punnen ( CPSO# 57716 )
Dr. P. Punnen ( CPSO# 57829 )

Business Address:
210 - 400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone Number: (905) 875-3710

Business Address:
404 - 960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 256-2737

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 336-4135

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHINNAMMA PUNNEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUNNEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989