Punnen, Punnamkuzhil Chandy (CPSO#: 57829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Apr 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Panjabi/Punjabi, Tamil

Education:Punjab University India, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 256-2737
Fax: (416) 256-9098
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 210
400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Canada
Phone: (905) 875-3710
Fax: (905) 875-1102
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Punnen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Punnen ( CPSO# 57716 )
Dr. P. Punnen ( CPSO# 57829 )

Business Address:
404 - 960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 256-2737

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 336-4135

Business Address:
210 - 400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone Number: (905) 875-3710

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Oct 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PUNNAMKUZHIL CHANDY PUNNEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUNNEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1991