Punnett, Angela Susanne (CPSO#: 74800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Haematology/Oncology
The Hospital for Sick Children
Room 1448
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5394
Fax: (416) 813-5230
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA SUSANNE PUNNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUNNETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2003