Puodziukas, Liudas Edward (CPSO#: 24780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Nov 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
375 Finley Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 2E2
Phone: (905) 686-6000
Fax: (905) 686-1491
Electoral District: 05

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 30, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Liudas Edward
            Puodziukas, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Puodziukas to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Puodziukas was the subject of a College investigation into
                  allegations that he failed to meet the standard of practice with respect
                  to his prescribing of opioids and record-keeping.  As a result of the
                  investigation:
                  
                        *     Dr. Puodziukas will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                  
                        *     Dr. Puodziukas will engage in professional education in safe
                              opioid prescribing and medical record-keeping.
                  
                        *     Dr. Puodziukas's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                        *     Dr. Puodziukas will keep a log of all his prescriptions for
                              Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances and all other
                              Monitored Drugs and will keep a copy of all of these
                              prescriptions in the corresponding patient chart.