Puranik, Prakash Raghunath (CPSO#: 53739)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Marathi

Education:University of Pune, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007