Purcell, Daniel Myron (CPSO#: 89422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-4377
Fax: (705) 789-1640
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Huntsville District Memorial
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Canada
Phone: (705) 789-2311
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Purcell & Rebecca Kent Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kent ( CPSO# 88818 )
Dr. D. Purcell ( CPSO# 89422 )

Business Address:
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-0022

Business Address:
348 Muskoka Road 3 north
Suite 102
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-4377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL MYRON PURCELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURCELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010