Purdon, Cameron John (CPSO#: 52750)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Surrey Street West
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone: (519) 763-6201
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Purdon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Purdon ( CPSO# 52750 )

Business Address:
21 Surrey Street West
Suite 201
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone Number: (519) 763-6201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMERON JOHN PURDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURDON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1984