Purdy, Lisa Patrice (CPSO#: 56925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NorthShore University HealthSystem
9977 Woods Drive
Skokie IL  60077
United States
Phone: (847) 663-8540
Fax: (847) 663-1015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA PATRICE PURDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Aug 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1991