Puri, Vinod (CPSO#: 65430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 11
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone: (905) 790-6362
Fax: (905) 790-6612
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Endoscopy and Inpatients
Brampton Campus
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Puri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Puri ( CPSO# 65430 )

Business Address:
470 Chrysler Drive
Suite 11
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 790-6362

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 01 Oct 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINOD PURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993