Purushotham Nambala, Sathyaki (CPSO#: 83966)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mysore University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 07 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2006 to 15 Feb 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2007