Purvis, Jane Catherine (CPSO#: 54202)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300 270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone: (705) 876-4511
Fax: (705) 775-1519
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Campbellford Memorial Hospital
P O Box 1027
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Purvis and Doris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Purvis ( CPSO# 54202 )
Dr. J. Doris ( CPSO# 52546 )

Business Address:
Suite 207
849 Alexander Court
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone Number: (705) 743-3851

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
Suite 300
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: (705) 876-4511

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 04 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE CATHERINE PURVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PURVIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1988