Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Puschmann, Rudolf (CPSO#: 70529)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Innsbruck, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1996