Pusic, Martin Victor (CPSO#: 58693)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 1991