Puskas, David Alexander (CPSO#: 64133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 344-1123
Fax: (807) 344-1166
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Puskas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017


Corporation Name: David Puskas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Puskas ( CPSO# 64133 )

Business Address:
984 Oliver Road
Suite 206
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 344-1123

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ALEXANDER PUSKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUSKAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1992