Putnins, Rita Elwine (CPSO#: 58205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of Eastern ON
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2834
Fax: (613) 738-4811
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RITA ELWINE PUTNINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUTNINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Oct 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Mar 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007