Puttappa Shivananda, Sandesh Kiran (CPSO#: 81651)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada

Education:Mysore University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shivananda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: BC Womens Hospital and Health Centre Room 1R-19 4500 Oak Street Vancouver, BC V6H 3V4 Tel: 604 875 2135 ext. 7353 Fax: 604 875 3106
Date Received: 10 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 30 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 10 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 10 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016