Puttaswamaiah, Sheela Dharshani (CPSO#: 63850)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2121 Medical Park Drive
Suite 4
Silver Spring MD  20902
United States
Phone: (301) 681-4422
Fax: (301) 681-1684

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEELA DHARSHANI PUTTASWAMAIAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUTTASWAMAIAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992