Putzer, Darryl Arthur (CPSO#: 107959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3M Centre, Western University
1151 Richmond St
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: 519-661-3011
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1001 Fanshawe College Blvd
London ON  N5Y 5R6
Canada
Phone: 519-452-4230
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jul 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARRYL ARTHUR PUTZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUTZER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Oct 2015 to 30 Oct 2015
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 07 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2017