Pyne, Dennis Anthony (CPSO#: 30033)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1978
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 09 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2005

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Nov 2004
Summary:

 On November 8, 2004, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Pyne committed acts of professional 
 misconduct in that:

(a)	he practised while knowing that he has deficient clinical ability;
(b)	he 
 practised during the period after he was notified by the College that he has deficient clinical 
 ability and before he was notified by the College that he no longer has deficient clinical 
 ability; and
(c)	he committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
 regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful. 

The 
 Discipline Committee imposed the following penalty: 

1.	The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Pyne 
 to attend before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded.

2.	The Discipline Committee directs 
 the Registrar to suspend Dr. Pyne(s certificate of  registration for a period of 10 months which 
 will include the period during which Dr. Pyne(s license was interimly suspended; the suspension 
 will cease on November 9, 2004. 

3.	The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose the 
 following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Pyne(s certificate of registration:

(a)	that 
 Dr. Pyne abide by the recommendation of the Quality Assurance Committee that 	he cease and desist 
 practice, unless and until that recommendation is changed, at 	which time he shall abide by any 
 other recommendation made by the Quality 	Assurance Committee.

4.	The Discipline Committee 
 directs that Dr. Pyne pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00.

5.	The Discipline 
 Committee further directs that the results of this proceeding be recorded on the public Register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 08, 2004


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Jun 2002
Summary:

 On June 24, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Pyne(s plea of guilt and found him guilty 
 of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
 profession .  By way of accepting a joint submission on penalty, the Discipline Committee ordered 
 that:

1)	Dr. Pyne be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
 Register;
2)	Dr. Pyne be referred to the Quality Assurance Committee and abide by the Committee(s 
 	recommendations and comply with any terms, limitations and conditions which that 	Committee may 
 impose on his certificate of registration
3)	Dr. Pyne pay costs to the College in the amount of 
 $2,500.00 by July 24, 2002; and,
4)	Dr. Pyne will complete the College of Physicians and Surgeons 
 of Ontario Boundaries 	Course within the next 12 months.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 24, 2002