Pyper, Cynthia Joan Bird (CPSO#: 50158)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alabama, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 864-4747
Fax: (905) 864-7099
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cynthia Pyper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pyper ( CPSO# 50158 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 864-4747

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA JOAN BIRD PYPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYPER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1989