Pyper, John Alexander (CPSO#: 51392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Mar 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fairview Medical Arts Centre
Suite 109
2200 Fairview Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4H9
Phone: (905) 681-6788
Fax: (905) 333-9775
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ALEXANDER PYPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYPER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1988