Pyselman, Colette Rinske (CPSO#: 51723)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham-Stouffville Health Centre
Suite 305
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7130
Fax: (905) 472-4130
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Colette Pyselman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 6 2007


Corporation Name: Dr. Colette Pyselman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pyselman ( CPSO# 51723 )

Business Address:
305 - 377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7130

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLETTE RINSKE PYSELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYSELMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1987