Pysklywec, Michael William (CPSO#: 71126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
848 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1L9
Phone: (905) 549-2552
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Pysklywec Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pysklywec ( CPSO# 71126 )

Business Address:
848 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 549-2552

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL WILLIAM PYSKLYWEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYSKLYWEC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Apr 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Apr 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2000