Pytka, Saul (CPSO#: 30527)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jul 1993