Qamar, Hina (CPSO#: 106391)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Baqai Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Jul 2015
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 20 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2016 to 06 Nov 2016
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Nov 2016