Qamarruddin, Fazilawati Binti A (CPSO#: 89851)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universitas Sumatra Utara, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2008 to 12 Nov 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 13 Nov 2008 to 14 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2009