Qazi, Abdul Aziz (CPSO#: 101164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
602, 500 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 416 978-6976
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDUL AZIZ QAZI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. QAZI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. QAZI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. QAZI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. QAZI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. QAZI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. QAZI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 4, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

It is alleged that Abdul Aziz Qazi on or about December 23, 2016 at the City of Toronto did commit a sexual assault on XX, contrary to section 271 of the Criminal Code.

Date of charge: December 23, 2016
Place of charges: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Service