Qiang, Wei (CPSO#: 106579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre De Médecine Familiale Bruyèr
75 Bruyère Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C7
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WEI QIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QIANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2017