Quackenbush, Benjamin Ralph Harris (CPSO#: 91599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Little Current Medical Associates
15 Meredith Street East
PO Box 549
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Phone: (705) 368-2450
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ben Quackenbush Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Quackenbush ( CPSO# 91599 )

Business Address:
Little Current Medical Associates
PO Box 549
15 Meredith Street East
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 368-2450

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN RALPH HARRIS QUACKENBUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUACKENBUSH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011