Quackenbush, Susie Jean (CPSO#: 70724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 256-9370
Fax: (613) 256-0949
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susie Quackenbush Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Quackenbush ( CPSO# 70724 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-9370

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2514

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jul 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSIE JEAN QUACKENBUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUACKENBUSH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 May 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 01 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2003