Quadir, Ambereen (CPSO#: 69378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
High Park Health Centre
Suite 507
2333 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A6
Phone: (416) 766-2718
Fax: (416) 766-0196
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMBEREEN QUADIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUADIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Oct 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1998