Quadri, Syed Mohammed (CPSO#: 73973)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Unmass Memorial Health Care Department of Surgery - Division of Thoracic Surgery 55 Lake Avenue Worcester, MA 01604
Date Received: 24 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 27 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 8 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013