Quaghebeur, Bert D M S C (CPSO#: 83659)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 27 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Catholic University of Louvain, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2005 to 04 Nov 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Nov 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 27 Oct 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2006