Quan, Corinna Mae (CPSO#: 61301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
c/o Tecumseh Byng Clinic
2085 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E3
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52539
Fax: (519) 254-3793
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Corinna Quan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Quan ( CPSO# 61301 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Tecumseh Byng Clinic
2085 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E3
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORINNA MAE QUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1989