Quan, Douglas (CPSO#: 61106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus, C8-124
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3355
Fax: (519) 663-3906
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Quan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Quan ( CPSO# 61106 )

Business Address:
Department of Surgery
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus - C8-124
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS QUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990