Quan, Jessica Wai-Chuen (CPSO#: 95189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Quan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Quan ( CPSO# 95189 )

Business Address:
17 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M4M 3H9
Phone Number: (416) 465-6606

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA WAI-CHUEN QUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2012 to 31 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014